Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 01/06/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/06/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 01/26/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/01/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/06/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/21/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/24/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/15/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/16/2006