Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/02/2005