Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/05/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/16/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/08/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew