Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/06/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/12/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/20/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/17/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/24/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/09/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/23/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/23/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/23/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/23/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/23/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/23/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/14/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/26/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/07/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/21/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/21/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/27/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/17/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/08/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/08/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/01/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/01/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 02/16/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/16/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/20/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/26/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/05/2006