Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/20/2005