Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/09/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/01/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/08/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/19/2006