Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/21/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/17/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/28/2005