Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2006