Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/19/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/10/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/16/2005