Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/12/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/17/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/29/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/20/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/06/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/28/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/29/2006