Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/21/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/04/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/09/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/08/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/08/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/15/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/15/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/2005