Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/28/2006