Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/12/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/19/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/21/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/27/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/05/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/05/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/18/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/18/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/19/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/19/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/14/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2006