Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/16/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/16/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/08/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/13/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/10/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/10/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/12/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/09/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2005