Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/17/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/26/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/28/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/04/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2006