Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/26/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/11/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/13/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/20/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/18/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/18/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/27/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/14/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/14/2006