There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Higher Education Affordability and Equity Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand incentives for education.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/17/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/18/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/17/2005Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2005Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2005Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/06/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/08/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/25/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/17/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/17/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness04/18/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1380.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1380. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/17/2005)

Higher Education Affordability and Equity Act of 2005 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) repeal the dollar limitation on the tax deduction for interest on education loans and expand eligibility for such deduction by revising the modified adjusted gross income phaseout for such deduction; (2) make the tax deduction for qualified tuition and related expenses permanent; (3) increase from $2,000 to $5,000 the maximum allowable contribution to a Coverdell savings account; (4) exclude from gross income amounts received for qualified higher education expenses (e.g., books, supplies, room, board, and special needs services); and (5) allow certain additional expenses (e.g., fees, books, supplies, and equipment) for purposes of the Hope Scholarship Tax Credit and provide that such tax credit shall not be reduced by Federal Pell Grants and Supplemental Educational Opportunity (SEOG) Grants.

Repeals the sunset provisions of the Economic Growth and Tax Relief Reconciliation Act of 2001 (EGTRRA) applicable to title IV, subtitles A, B, and D (Affordable Education Provisions) of such Act.

Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 (HEA) to provide that a qualified education benefit shall not be considered an asset of a student for purposes of a student financial need analysis. Defines "qualified education benefit" as a tax-exempt tuition credits program, a State education prepayment plan, and a Coverdell education savings account.