Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/15/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/01/2005