Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/30/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/02/2005