Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/29/2005