Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/28/2005