Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/19/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/23/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/23/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/07/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/24/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/24/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/24/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/24/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/29/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/18/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/18/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/18/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/28/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/28/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/17/2005