Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/05/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/12/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/12/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/12/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/19/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/19/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/19/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/19/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/19/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/21/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/26/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/05/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/09/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/28/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/12/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/12/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/01/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/06/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/12/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/29/2006