Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/13/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/22/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2006