Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/27/2006