Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/18/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/16/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/27/2006