Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/01/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/10/2006