Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/26/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/27/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/19/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2005