Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/04/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/21/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/21/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/16/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/20/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/26/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/26/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/27/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/13/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/29/2006