Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/12/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/03/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/03/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/16/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/16/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/15/2005