Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/20/2005