Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/05/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/05/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/05/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/05/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/05/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/10/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/12/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/12/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/16/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/17/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/26/2005