Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/12/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/12/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/12/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/12/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/20/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/10/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/11/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/12/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/23/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/08/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/14/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/20/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/23/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/29/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/30/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/12/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/12/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/10/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/07/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/15/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/07/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/06/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/24/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/15/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/13/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/20/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2006