Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/27/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/27/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/04/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/04/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/18/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/19/2005