Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/13/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/25/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/22/2005