Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/19/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/20/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/20/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/21/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/21/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/26/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/28/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/10/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/11/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/07/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/20/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/27/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/12/2006