Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/26/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/08/2006