Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/27/2005