There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Benefits Tax Relief Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 1993 income tax increase on Social Security benefits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/06/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/06/2005Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/21/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/26/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/10/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sekula Gibbs, Shelley [R-TX-22] 12/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/06/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1517. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2005)

Social Security Benefits Tax Relief Act of 2005 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the 85 percent maximum tax rate on Social Security and Railroad Retirement benefits enacted by the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1993. Appropriates, from the general fund, to the Hospital Insurance Trust Fund amounts equal to the reduction in revenues resulting from this repeal.