Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/21/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/23/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/01/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/26/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/10/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sekula Gibbs, Shelley [R-TX-22] 12/05/2006