Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/06/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/07/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/13/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/22/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/26/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/18/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew