Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/19/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005