Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/08/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/13/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/16/2005