Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/19/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/24/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/11/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/18/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/16/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/22/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/14/2006