Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/27/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/27/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/27/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/27/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/27/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/27/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/27/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/05/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/23/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/23/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/16/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/22/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/22/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/20/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/15/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/26/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/17/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/17/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/04/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/25/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/25/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/26/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/03/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/03/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/22/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/22/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/15/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/15/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/25/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/28/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/28/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 12/08/2006