Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/12/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/20/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/20/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/20/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/20/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/20/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/20/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/26/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/26/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/26/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/15/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/15/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/15/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/30/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/30/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/29/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/29/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/29/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/27/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/27/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/27/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/18/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/08/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/08/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/08/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/29/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/29/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/05/2006