Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/09/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/12/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/19/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/03/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2006