There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Guard and Reserve Bill of Rights Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enhance the benefits and protections for members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces who are called or ordered to extended active duty, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/12/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
04/29/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/25/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/22/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/21/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/12/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce04/12/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/22/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/12/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations04/29/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/12/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/21/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/12/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity04/25/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1565.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1565. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2005)

National Guard and Reserve Bill of Rights Act of 2005 - Requires the Secretary of Defense to limit the length of assignment of reservists during U.S. Central Command deployments of not less than one year.

Requires the Secretary to submit to specified congressional committees a report on Department of Defense (DOD) policies and communications regarding the length of deployments for reservists in connection with Operation Iraqi Freedom.

Directs the Secretary of the Army to designate a senior level official of the Department of the Army to implement recommendations for executive action to address military pay problems.

Removes conditions on Ready Reserve members' eligibility for TRICARE enrollment. Makes such eligibility permanent.

Requires the Secretary concerned to pay applicable premiums to continue qualified health benefit plan coverage for family members of eligible reservists serving on active duty for the benefits coverage continuation period.

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to fund child care for members of the Armed Forces on active duty for Operation Enduring Freedom or Operation Iraqi Freedom.

Expands eligibility for monthly educational assistance benefits to include reservists who have served on active duty for a cumulative period of 24 months during any five-year period.

Reduces from 60 to 55 the age at which members of Reserve components may receive military retirement pay.

Establishes the position of Deputy Under Secretary of Defense for Personnel and Readiness (Reserve Affairs). Eliminates the position of Assistant Secretary of Defense for Reserve Affairs. Reduces the number of Assistant Secretaries of Defense.

Makes National Guard appropriations available to establish and operate offices to assist in readjusting to civilian life Guard personnel being released from active or full-time duty of more than 30 days.