Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2005