Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/20/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/20/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/20/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/21/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/10/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/16/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/16/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/11/2006